open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00443
    Party Name:Murphy v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Litigation Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Number Change]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44785
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =