U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Triple T Enterprises v. KFC Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Stay]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 30, 2020: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 04, 2020: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 07, 2020: [Litigation Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent Filed]
  • January 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 24, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • January 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 02, 2020: [Corrective Entry - Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.