U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00514
  • Case Name: Sivak v. Christensen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.