U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Jones v. Infinity Management and Investments, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.