U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00515
  • Case Name: DiPierro v. Humkey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Response (generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Complaint]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 31, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.