U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Idaho State Correction Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • May 27, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Complaint]
  • January 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.