U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Lilue v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 06, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 06, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Consent Filed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2020: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 03, 2020: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2020: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.