U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Ferguson v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 28, 2020: [Waive]
  • January 28, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • January 03, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Complaint]
  • January 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.