open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00038-1
    Party Name:USA v. Flappingeagle
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45331
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =