open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:4:20-cv-00078
    Party Name:Walton v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order (SS)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Review]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45350
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =