open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00047-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rauch
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Sealed Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45321
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =