open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:20-40614-
    Party Name:Erma Dora Holler
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?164718
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =