U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hampton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Detain]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.