U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • November 20, 2020: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.