U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2021: [Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.