U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 07, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Detain]
  • December 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.