U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00085
  • Case Name: St. John et al v. Kootenai County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Set Aside]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Disqualify Judge]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 18, 2021: [Service]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Waive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.