U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Davis, et al. v. Blast Properties Inc., et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 18, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 02, 2025: [Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Bifurcate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: [In Limine]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [In Limine]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • June 09, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.