U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Malone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 19, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 10, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.