U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2021: [Detain]
  • July 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.