U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00158-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Osborn et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Vacate]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
  • November 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Detain]
  • July 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.