U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loewen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 19, 2021: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.