U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00153-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Prather et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Detain]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.