U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manees
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendation of Guilty Plea]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Detain]
  • July 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.