U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00359
  • Case Name: Pizzuto v. Tewalt, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Compel]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 29, 2022: [Waive]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 21, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 21, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.