U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siddoway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2022: [Release from Custody]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • September 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Separate Trial on Counts]
  • August 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.