U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Release from Custody]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detain]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.