U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00175-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bird et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Expedite]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Expedite]
  • November 14, 2022: [Medical Treatment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.