U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00506-
  • Case Name: Daniel Stelle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Objection to Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.