U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-20305-
  • Case Name: Ty Matthew Ward and Tiffany Mae Ward
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice re: Administrative Expense Claims]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Conversion]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Conversion Order]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Convert Case to 7]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Objection]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • November 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [Pay Trustee]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.