U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40488-
  • Case Name: Floyd Batterton and Carol Batterton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.