U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40492-
  • Case Name: Summer Partridge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order To Debtor's Employer To Pay The Trustee]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Wages]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.