U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40512-
  • Case Name: Lisa Thao Davies
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
December, 2022
  • December 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, Kimberly L. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.