U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-08024-
  • Case Name: Stevens v. Jeppesen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Order (Generic)]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Amend]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.