U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40571-
  • Case Name: William Bennett Trader and Adrianna Trader
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Application for Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
September, 2024
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.