U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20237-
  • Case Name: Dale Dustan Zirbel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Stipulated Order]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Turnover]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Objection]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Turnover]
September, 2024
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Zimmerman, C Barry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.