U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00644-
  • Case Name: Suzette Yvette Hefner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Dismissed Case]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Closing Dismissed Case]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Dismiss]
September, 2024
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice of Additional Missing Documents]
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • September 28, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.