U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40158-
  • Case Name: Millenkamp Cattle, Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Enforce]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Join]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Join]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Enforce]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Order]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Application for Compensation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Join]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Response]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • December 16, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Consider]
  • December 08, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Compel]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Order on Pro Hac Vice Application]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Interim Distribution]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.