U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40206-
  • Case Name: Lisa Christine Burton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.