U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40388-
  • Case Name: Jesus Ochoa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of hearing on Ch.11 Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.