U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00228-
  • Case Name: Jonathan Carlyle Carter and Tara Rebecca Rose
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Stipulated Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Court's Certificate of Service of Certified Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Compensation]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Sell]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Response]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Application for Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Amend]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Stipulated Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.