U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-08016-
  • Case Name: T.R. & Marianne Gillespie Estate v. Gillespie et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stipulated Order]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Vacating Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Stay]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Consolidate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.