U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20318-
  • Case Name: Tammy D Heath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Dismissed Case]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Closing Dismissed Case]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.