U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20183-
  • Case Name: No Limits Aviation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Shorten Time]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Order (Generic Text )]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Vacate]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Stipulation]
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Objection]
  • December 17, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Examination]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Assume Lease on Executory Contracts]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Application for Interim Professional Compensation]
  • October 05, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.