U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40583-
  • Case Name: Daniel Tate Brangham and Jessica Chantal Pehrson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice re: Administrative Expense Claims]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Conversion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stevens, - Trustee Kimberly L [Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Convert Case to 7]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Wages]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor Directing Payment to Trustee]
  • October 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.13 Plan]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Pay Trustee]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.