U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40069-
  • Case Name: Stephen A Devereaux and Katherine C Blomquist
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Objection to Claim]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCallister, Kathleen A. [Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.