U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00552-
  • Case Name: Payton Tyler Hill and Tabitha Leah Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Disallowing Claim of Exemption]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Order on Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemption]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Disallowing Claim of Exemption]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Order on Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemption]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.