U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00089-
  • Case Name: Dustin E Weniger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Extend Time to Object to Discharge of Debtor (11 USC 727)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Extend Time to Object to Discharge of Debtor Pursuant to 11 USC 727]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.