U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20431-
  • Case Name: Matthew Dominick Price
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Appeal - Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Transmittal]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Appeal - Notice of Referral to District Court]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Consider]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Appeal - Appellant Designation]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Appeal - Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Consider]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Extend Time]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Consider]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Consider]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Consider]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kurtz, Timothy R. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.