U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40009-
  • Case Name: June Wagner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Avoiding Lien]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Geile, Patrick John [Avoid Lien]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.